MO HB1110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of a "Lake Area Residential Rental District."
Title
Authorizes the creation of a "Lake Area Residential Rental District."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1110&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2288H.01I.pdf |