MO HB1096 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county health center to make authorized payments through an electronic funds transfer system
Title
Allows a county health center to make authorized payments through an electronic funds transfer system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-14 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-25 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 750 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-19 | Prefiled (H) |