MO HB1082 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person who has been awarded a Korea Defense Service Medal to obtain a special license plate
Title
Allows a person who has been awarded a Korea Defense Service Medal to obtain a special license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) - Transportation |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1082&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1082I.htm |