MO HB1062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding services for individuals with disabilities
Title
Changes the laws regarding services for individuals with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) - Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |