MO HB1039 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that two-year colleges and four-year colleges shall be eligible for the same types of directional and official signs
Title
Provides that two-year colleges and four-year colleges shall be eligible for the same types of directional and official signs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |