MO HB1022 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions relating to the filing of certain petitions by a special victim and establishes the offenses of interference with a health care facility and an ambulance service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to the filing of certain petitions by a special victim and establishes the offenses of interference with a health care facility and an ambulance service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-24HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-09HouseAction Postponed (H)
2021-03-09HouseExecutive Session Continued
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Insurance(H)
2021-02-03HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback