MO HB1 | 2019 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to sales and use tax allowances for certain items

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to sales and use tax allowances for certain items

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - House: HB 1 (*HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 37 N: 107 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-09-11 - House - House: HB 1 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - House: HB 1 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-09-13SenateTaken Up
2019-09-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-09-13SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-09-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-09-12SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, September 13, 2019, 8:30 a.m., Bingham Conference Room
2019-09-12SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-09-12SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-09-12SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-09-12SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-09-12SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 11:15 am or upon morning recess whichever is later, SCR 1
2019-09-12SenateSecond read and referred: Ways and Means(S)
2019-09-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-09-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 2
2019-09-11HouseTaken Up
2019-09-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-09-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-09-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-09-11HousePerfected (H)
2019-09-11HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-09-11HouseTaken Up
2019-09-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-09-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-09-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-09-10HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-09-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2019-09-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-09-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-09-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-09-10HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2019-09-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-09-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback