MN SF907 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State building efficiency, fleet management improvements, and Medicaid and tax fraud prevention and detection consulting services contracts for improvements to state-operated systems and services requirements
Title
State building efficiency, fleet management improvements, and Medicaid and tax fraud prevention and detection consulting services contracts for improvements to state-operated systems and services requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Mike Parry [R] | Sen. Amy Koch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Taxes |
2011-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Referred to State Government Innovation and Veterans |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |