MN SF876 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Ingebrigtsen
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Ingebrigtsen
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary custom meat processors exemption from licensure and inspection requirements authorization
Title
Temporary custom meat processors exemption from licensure and inspection requirements authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Author added Ingebrigtsen |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Tomassoni |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF356 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy