MN SF838 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child pornography penalties increase; mandatory minimum sentences establishment; sentencing guidelines commission modification of sex offender grid requirement
Title
Child pornography penalties increase; mandatory minimum sentences establishment; sentencing guidelines commission modification of sex offender grid requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chief author added Utke |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Koran |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF89 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Author added Edelson