MN HF89 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child pornography offenses penalties increased, mandatory minimum sentences created, and Sentencing Guidelines Commission directed to modify sex offender grid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child pornography offenses penalties increased, mandatory minimum sentences created, and Sentencing Guidelines Commission directed to modify sex offender grid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Runbeck and Haley
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Theis, Dettmer, and Bennett
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF838 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Author added Draheim

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback