MN SF757 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis use regulation; Cannabis Management board and advisory councils establishment; possession and use legalization and limit; businesses licensing, inspection, and regulation; labeling and advertisement; private cannabis cultivation; medical cannabis regulatory authority transfer; sales tax; grant and loan programs; appropriation
Title
Cannabis use regulation; Cannabis Management board and advisory councils establishment; possession and use legalization and limit; businesses licensing, inspection, and regulation; labeling and advertisement; private cannabis cultivation; medical cannabis regulatory authority transfer; sales tax; grant and loan programs; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Authors added Fateh; Rest |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF600 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Bill was passed as amended