MN HF600 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Bill was passed as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus cannabis bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus cannabis bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Daudt motion Lay on the Table (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - House: 76 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - House - House: 64 - Amendment to West Amendment - Nays (Y: 68 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HouseBill was passed as amended
2021-05-13HouseMotion did not prevail
2021-05-13HouseMotion to lay on the table
2021-05-13HouseThird reading as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended
2021-05-11HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 13, 2021
2021-05-10HouseSecond reading
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
2021-04-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-03-25HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
2021-03-25HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
2021-03-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy
2021-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
2021-02-22HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
2021-02-01HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF757 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0600&ssn=0&y=2021
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=0&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=1&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=2&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=3&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=4&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=5&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=6&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=7&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=8&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF600&version=9&session=ls92&session_year=2021&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF0600&session_number=0&year=2021&id=291
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF0600&session_number=0&year=2021&id=292
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF0600&session_number=0&year=2021&id=293
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mn.gov/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=92&billnum=HF0600&session_number=0&year=2021&id=294

Bill Comments

feedback