MN SF658 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Subminimum wage elimination, task force creation, and wage statute and rules repeal
Title
Subminimum wage elimination, task force creation, and wage statute and rules repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF439 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Author added Hanson, J.