MN SF651 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Author added Anderson, P.
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dyslexia screening requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexia screening requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateAuthor added Anderson, P.
2019-02-04SenateAuthor added Wiger
2019-01-31SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-01-31SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1412 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Author added Dettmer

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback