MN SF6 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governor's peacetime emergency order or rule termination by the legislature if the emergency is continued for more than 30 days authorization
Title
Governor's peacetime emergency order or rule termination by the legislature if the emergency is continued for more than 30 days authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Author added Kiffmeyer |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF371 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Author added Rasmusson