MN SF55 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Author added Boldon
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Juvenile Restorative Justice establishment; local steering committees establishment of local juvenile restorative justice programs requirement; appropriating money

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Juvenile Restorative Justice establishment; local steering committees establishment of local juvenile restorative justice programs requirement; appropriating money

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateAuthor added Boldon
2023-03-30SenateAuthor added Oumou Verbeten
2023-01-12SenateAuthor added Kunesh
2023-01-09SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF46 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Curran

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback