MN HF46 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Author added Curran
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Juvenile Restorative Justice established, local steering committees required to establish local juvenile restorative justice programs, grants established, reports required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Juvenile Restorative Justice established, local steering committees required to establish local juvenile restorative justice programs, grants established, reports required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseAuthor added Curran
2023-02-09HouseAuthor added Smith
2023-02-08HouseAuthors added Norris, Clardy, and Frazier
2023-01-25HouseAuthor added Berg
2023-01-18HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety Finance and Policy
2023-01-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF55 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Author added Boldon

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback