MN SF5354 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Chief author added Klein
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Chief author added Klein
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advance deposit wagering, card playing, and pari-mutuel betting conduct provisions and historical horse racing and other games authorization prohibition
Title
Advance deposit wagering, card playing, and pari-mutuel betting conduct provisions and historical horse racing and other games authorization prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Dziedzic (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Chief author added Klein |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Dziedzic |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF5274 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Author added Tabke