MN SF529 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord to require a tenant to provide documentation supporting the tenant's need for a service or support animal
Title
Landlord to require a tenant to provide documentation supporting the tenant's need for a service or support animal
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF566 |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF566 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed