MN HF566 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord permitted to require tenant to provide documentation supporting tenant's need for service or support animal.
Title
Landlord permitted to require tenant to provide documentation supporting tenant's need for service or support animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-05-10 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF529 |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Johnson |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF529 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Second reading