MN SF4371 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Author added Hoffman
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Author added Hoffman
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
City of Ramsey special tax increment financing authority modifications
Title
City of Ramsey special tax increment financing authority modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4340 (Similar To) 2024-03-29 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division