IL SB0856 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0888
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0888
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an applicant for an identification card or driver's license who is an employee of the Department of Children and Family Services with a job title of "Child Protection Specialist Trainee", "Child Protection Specialist", "Child Protection Advanced Specialist", "Child Welfare Specialist Trainee", "Child Welfare Specialist", or "Child Welfare Advanced Specialist" may elect to use his or her office or work address in lieu of the applicant's residence or mailing address on an application for an identification card or driver's license. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0888 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2024 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2024-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 14, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-11-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-31 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-10-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-10-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2023-10-25 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; D. Turner |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 65 | 20-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |