OK SB688 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB688
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Remove as author Senator Stanley; authored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Remove as author Senator Stanley; authored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers licenses; allowing for certain marker on drivers licenses; veterans; disabled veterans; requiring certain approval; directing certain information exchange. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Drivers licenses; allowing for certain marker on drivers licenses; veterans; disabled veterans; requiring certain approval; directing certain information exchange. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Stanley; authored by Senator Pederson |
2023-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-19 | House | Amended |
2023-04-19 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | Emergency added |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB688 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - HAs read