CA SB1402 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71450 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental protection.
Title
30x30 goal: state agencies: adoption, revision, or establishment of plans, policies, and regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1402 Min (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1402 Min (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 4071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3982.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3729.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 3529.) (April 9). |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |