MN SF426 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Author added Marty
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Law enforcement agencies sharing of criminal history background check data with the Minnesota Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement agencies sharing of criminal history background check data with the Minnesota Board of Peace Officer Standards and Training authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenateAuthor added Marty
2023-02-13SenateSecond reading
2023-02-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-01-19SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF823 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback