MN SF4202 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential energy code adoption standards and timelines modification; residential rebate program creation; appropriating money
Title
Residential energy code adoption standards and timelines modification; residential rebate program creation; appropriating money
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Mitchell [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Susan Pha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4242 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy