MN SF3957 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added McEwen
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Worker safety requirements establishment
Title
Worker safety requirements establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2774 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Referred to Labor and Industry Policy