MN HF2774 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to Labor and Industry Policy
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred to Labor and Industry Policy
Pending: Senate Labor and Industry Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Warehouse distribution worker safety requirements established, and money appropriated.
Title
Warehouse distribution worker safety requirements established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Industry Policy |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-03-28 | House | Third reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Lillie |
2022-03-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 28, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Hassan |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Frazier; Boldon; Vang; Gomez; Jordan; Nelson, M.; Koegel; Lippert; Sundin; Freiberg; Lee; Fischer; Olson, L.; Davnie; Agbaje |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Liebling, Long and Feist |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Frederick |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Howard |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3957 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Author added McEwen