MN SF3531 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Koran
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Koran
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Third-party commercial driver's license road tests authorization and appropriation
Title
Third-party commercial driver's license road tests authorization and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3745 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy