MN SF3523 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Maye Quade
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Maye Quade
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Behavior analysis licensing requirement modifications provision and appropriation
Title
Behavior analysis licensing requirement modifications provision and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Maye Quade |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Authors added Hoffman; Abeler |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3741 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Author added Kraft