MN SF3468 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data security account appropriation
Title
Data security account appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4069 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections