MN SF3325 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 306 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 306 05/11/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Local impact notes request from finance and ways and means committees authorization
Title
Local impact notes request from finance and ways and means committees authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. Tarryl Clark [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 306 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Governor's action Approval 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-06 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2010-05-05 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-05-05 | House: Third reading | |
2010-05-04 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | House: Second reading | |
2010-05-03 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-04-28 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3748 | |
2010-04-28 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Senate: Authors added Bonoff; Clark | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Author added Rest | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-26 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-26 | Senate: Referred to Finance |