MN SF2862 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Koran
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Koran
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provision that electronic pull-tab devices, games, and systems are not subject to changes in rule unless authorized by the legislature
Title
Provision that electronic pull-tab devices, games, and systems are not subject to changes in rule unless authorized by the legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3504 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Author added Poston