MN SF276 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Third-party programs and third-party testers to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers licenses; requirements and criteria specified; audits requirements; appeals of decisions made by commissioner of public safety authorization
Title
Third-party programs and third-party testers to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers licenses; requirements and criteria specified; audits requirements; appeals of decisions made by commissioner of public safety authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Kiffmeyer |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF391 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Scott