MN HF391 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Third-party programs and third-party testers authorized to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers' licenses, third-party programs and testers requirement and criteria specified, audits required, commissioner of public safety decision appeals allowed, and record keeping and reporting required.
Title
Third-party programs and third-party testers authorized to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers' licenses, third-party programs and testers requirement and criteria specified, audits required, commissioner of public safety decision appeals allowed, and record keeping and reporting required.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Garofalo and Haley |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF276 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Second reading