MN SF2709 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 318 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 318 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Out-of-state offenders (prisoners) housed in county and regional jails authorization; inmate room and board payment time credited for time served inclusion
Title
Out-of-state offenders (prisoners) housed in county and regional jails authorization; inmate room and board payment time credited for time served inclusion
Sponsors
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Ann Lynch [D] | Sen. Patricia Pariseau [R] | Sen. Kathy Saltzman [D] |
Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 318 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-14 | Governor's action Approval 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-10 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-06 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-06 | Senate: Senate concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-05-06 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-05-05 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-05 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-05 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-03 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-30 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3038 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Referred to Judiciary |