MN SF2584 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2955
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2955
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disability discrimination claims related to architectural barriers requirements establishment; building inspection reports notices requirement
Title
Disability discrimination claims related to architectural barriers requirements establishment; building inspection reports notices requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2955 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with HF2955 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2955 (Similar To) 2016-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 159