MN SF2504 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution declaring September 7, 2019 as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day
Title
Resolution declaring September 7, 2019 as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2515 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Referred to Rules and Administration