MN HF2515 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Great Lakes; a resolution declaring September 7, 2019 as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day in Minnesota, learning about Great Lakes and St. Lawrence River importance to economic and environment encouraged, and recognition across region urged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great Lakes; a resolution declaring September 7, 2019 as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day in Minnesota, learning about Great Lakes and St. Lawrence River importance to economic and environment encouraged, and recognition across region urged.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Rules and Administration
2019-05-14SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-14SenateReceived from House
2019-05-13HouseBill was passed
2019-05-13HouseThird reading
2019-05-09HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 13, 2019
2019-05-09HouseSecond reading
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-05-07HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2504 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback