MN SF2173 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/09/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/09/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Automated drug distribution systems authorization; physicians drugs dispensing in health care facilities located in health professional shortage areas
Title
Automated drug distribution systems authorization; physicians drugs dispensing in health care facilities located in health professional shortage areas
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kruse [R] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/09/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Governor's action Approval 04/09/12 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Third reading vote: 59-0 |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-04-03 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 130-0 |
2012-04-03 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-03 | House | Amended |
2012-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2626 |
2012-03-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Author added Sheran |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |