MN SF1861 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Autism Awareness and Acceptance Day establishment
Title
Autism Awareness and Acceptance Day establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1968 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Second reading