MN SF1712 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus retirement bill
Title
Omnibus retirement bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 22 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House |
2021-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 15, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1758 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Joint rule 2.03 waived