MN SF1598 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic assault by strangulation impact on custody, parenting plans and parenting time modification
Title
Domestic assault by strangulation impact on custody, parenting plans and parenting time modification
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] |
Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 55-0 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1654 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Author added Slocum.