MN HF1654 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic assault by strangulation added to list of crimes impacting custody, parenting plans, and parenting time.
Title
Domestic assault by strangulation added to list of crimes impacting custody, parenting plans, and parenting time.
Sponsors
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] |
Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1598 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance