MN SF1525 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education Savings Accounts for Students Act; appropriations
Title
Education Savings Accounts for Students Act; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1528 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Author added Heinrich