MN SF1014 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Chief author added Newman
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bicycle traffic regulations, powers and duties modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bicycle traffic regulations, powers and duties modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateChief author added Newman
2020-05-15SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Jasinski
2019-02-14SenateChief author added Jasinski
2019-02-14SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Carlson
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF462 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 100

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback