MN HF462 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; bicycle traffic regulations, powers, and duties modified.
Title
COVID-19; bicycle traffic regulations, powers, and duties modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: CONCURRENCE AND REPASSAGE (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 100 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-16 | House | Author added Hornstein as chief author |
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2020-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2020-05-16 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 5: withdrawn, placed on General Orders |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading |
2019-02-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1014 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Chief author added Newman