MN SF1006 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 82 03/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 82 03/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance; providing for extended benefits
Title
Unemployment insurance; providing for extended benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Secretary of State Chapter 82 03/24/16 | |
2016-03-29 | Governor's action Approval 3/24/16 | |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Returned from House |
2016-03-24 | Governor approval | |
2016-03-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 113-17 |
2016-03-24 | House | Third reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Second reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2016-03-10 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2016-03-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-3 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1405 (Similar To) 2015-03-23 - Author added Lien.