MN HF986 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax and fee exemptions provided for eligible veterans with a disability, including certain registration taxes, license plates fees, title fees, driver's license and identification card fees, and motor vehicle sales taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax and fee exemptions provided for eligible veterans with a disability, including certain registration taxes, license plates fees, title fees, driver's license and identification card fees, and motor vehicle sales taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy
2023-02-08HouseAuthors added Daniels and Wiens
2023-02-06HouseAuthor added Norris
2023-01-30HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback